DC B25-0887 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 19 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-07-19 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 2, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on July 19 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-07-19 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 2, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modification Nos. 1, 3, 4, and 5 to Contract No. DCAM-19-AE-0014 with Alphatec PC Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2024
Title
Modification Nos. 1, 3, 4, and 5 to Contract No. DCAM-19-AE-0014 with Alphatec PC Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2024
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-07-09 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-19 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 2, 2024 |
2024-07-09 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2024-07-09 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-07-02 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |