DC CER25-0123 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on October 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-03 - Resolution ACR25-0121, Effective from Oct 03, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 014582
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on October 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-03 - Resolution ACR25-0121, Effective from Oct 03, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 014582
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Latin American Montessori Bilingual Public Charter School 20th Anniversary Celebration Recognition Resolution of 2023
Title
Latin American Montessori Bilingual Public Charter School 20th Anniversary Celebration Recognition Resolution of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-10-03 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-03 | Council | Resolution ACR25-0121, Effective from Oct 03, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 014582 |
2023-10-03 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR25-0121 |
2023-10-03 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-10-03 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2023-09-27 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |