DC PR24-0996 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-13 - Resolution R24-0725, Effective from Dec 20, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 000236
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-13 - Resolution R24-0725, Effective from Dec 20, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 000236
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
District of Columbia Board of Elections James Caleb Boggs, III Confirmation Resolution of 2022
Title
District of Columbia Board of Elections James Caleb Boggs, III Confirmation Resolution of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-12-20 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-13 | Council | Resolution R24-0725, Effective from Dec 20, 2022 Published in DC Register Page 000236 |
2022-12-20 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0725 |
2022-12-20 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-12-15 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-12-15 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR24-0996 |
2022-12-14 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2022-11-04 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0996 Published in the DC Register |
2022-11-01 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2022-10-21 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |