DC PR25-0111 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-21 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-21 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
River East at Grandview Condominium Property Tax Exemption Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023
Title
River East at Grandview Condominium Property Tax Exemption Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-21 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2023-02-17 | Council | Resolution R25-0022, Effective from Feb 07, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 002117 |
2023-02-07 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0022 |
2023-02-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-02-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |