DC PR25-0117 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-14 - Resolution R25-0095, Effective from Apr 04, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 004332
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-14 - Resolution R25-0095, Effective from Apr 04, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 004332
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
The Sense of the Council on the Establishment of an America250 Commission Resolution of 2023
Title
The Sense of the Council on the Establishment of an America250 Commission Resolution of 2023
Sponsors
Cnc. Matthew Frumin [D] | Cnc. Janeese Lewis George [D] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Zachary Parker [D] |
Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Brooke Pinto [D] | Cnc. Christina Henderson [I] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-14 | Council | Resolution R25-0095, Effective from Apr 04, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 004332 |
2023-04-04 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0095 |
2023-04-04 | Council | Final Reading |
2023-03-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2023-03-03 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0117 Published in the DC Register |
2023-02-21 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |