DC PR25-0459 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-20 - Resolution R25-0277, Effective from Oct 03, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 013873
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-20 - Resolution R25-0277, Effective from Oct 03, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 013873
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
DC Water Critical Infrastructure Freedom of Information Clarification Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023
Title
DC Water Critical Infrastructure Freedom of Information Clarification Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-10-03 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-20 | Council | Resolution R25-0277, Effective from Oct 03, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 013873 |
2023-10-03 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0277 |
2023-10-03 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-10-03 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2023-10-02 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |