DC PR25-0564 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-29 - Resolution R25-0390, Effective from Dec 19, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 016632
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-29 - Resolution R25-0390, Effective from Dec 19, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 016632
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fairness in Renting Notice Clarification Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023
Title
Fairness in Renting Notice Clarification Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-12-19 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-29 | Council | Resolution R25-0390, Effective from Dec 19, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 016632 |
2023-12-19 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0390 |
2023-12-19 | Council | Final Reading |
2023-12-19 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2023-12-14 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |