DC PR25-0764 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Resolution R25-0497, Effective from May 07, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 006132
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Resolution R25-0497, Effective from May 07, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 006132
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Unlawful Restrictions in Land Records Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024
Title
Unlawful Restrictions in Land Records Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-07 - Council - CM PINTO MOTION TO RECONSIDER (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-17 | Council | Resolution R25-0497, Effective from May 07, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 006132 |
2024-05-07 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0497 |
2024-05-07 | Council | CM PINTO MOTION TO RECONSIDER |
2024-05-07 | Council | Final Reading |
2024-05-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-05-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |