DC PR25-0805 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-19 - Resolution R25-0570, Effective from Jul 09, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 008584
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-19 - Resolution R25-0570, Effective from Jul 09, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 008584
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Jubilee Housing, Inc. - The Maycroft, Revenue Bonds Project Approval Resolution of 2024
Title
Jubilee Housing, Inc. - The Maycroft, Revenue Bonds Project Approval Resolution of 2024
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-07-09 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-19 | Council | Resolution R25-0570, Effective from Jul 09, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 008584 |
2024-07-09 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0570 |
2024-07-09 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2024-07-03 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR25-0805 |
2024-07-03 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2024-07-02 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2024-06-20 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2024-06-20 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2024-06-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-06-11 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2024-05-31 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-05-24 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0805 Published in the DC Register |
2024-05-22 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-05-13 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |