DC PR25-0808 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-16 - Committee Report Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-16 - Committee Report Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Board of Social Work Selerya Moore Confirmation Resolution of 2024
Title
Board of Social Work Selerya Moore Confirmation Resolution of 2024
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-16 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2024-07-11 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR25-0808 |
2024-07-10 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2024-07-10 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2024-07-10 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2024-07-10 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2024-07-09 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-06-25 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2024-06-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-06-11 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2024-06-06 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-05-31 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-05-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-05-24 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0808 Published in the DC Register |
2024-05-15 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR25-0808 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/55445/Introduction/PR25-0808-Introduction.pdf |