DC PR25-0881 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-09 - Approved with Resolution Number R25-0589
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-09 - Approved with Resolution Number R25-0589
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Family Re-Housing Stabilization Program Protection Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024
Title
Family Re-Housing Stabilization Program Protection Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-07-09 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Council - Postponed to POSTPONED TO JULY 9, 2024 (R.White) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Council - Postponed to POSTPONED TO JULY 9, 2024 (R.White) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-09 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0589 |
2024-07-09 | Council | Final Reading |
2024-06-25 | Council | Postponed to JULY 9, 2024 (R.White) |
2024-06-25 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-06-24 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |