DC PR25-0888 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-11 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-11 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Board of Directors of the Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Spring Worth Reappointment Resolution of 2024
Title
Board of Directors of the Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Spring Worth Reappointment Resolution of 2024
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-11 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2024-07-09 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2024-07-05 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-07-05 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0888 Published in the DC Register |
2024-07-02 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-07-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR25-0888 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/55862/Introduction/PR25-0888-Introduction.pdf |