DC PR25-0918 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-09-19 - Roundtable Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-09-19 - Roundtable Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Real Estate Commission Frank Pietranton Confirmation Resolution of 2024
Title
Real Estate Commission Frank Pietranton Confirmation Resolution of 2024
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-19 | Council | Roundtable Hearing |
2024-08-23 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-08-15 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-07-12 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0918 Published in the DC Register |
2024-07-09 | Council | Referred to Committee on Housing |
2024-07-02 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR25-0918 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/55935/Introduction/PR25-0918-Introduction.pdf |