DE HB125 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]
Summary
This House Substitute bill eliminates any reference to § 4137 in Title 11 since it will remain as a separate section in the Delaware Code. This House Substitute requires all public schools to offer only students who qualify for a reduced-price meal, under the federal School Breakfast Program and National School Lunch Program, a free breakfast and lunch every school day. This House Substitute also eliminates a requirement that all schools and local education agencies, who qualify, must participate in the federal Community Eligibility Provision, under 42 U.S.C. §1759a (a)(1)(F) since there is no such federal mandate. This Act also removes the requirement that a parent or guardian for each student complete a household income form since that requirement is already set forth in this title. This Substitute bill also removes the delayed effective date. This Act will take effect beginning the school year following its enactment.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Free School Meals.
Sponsors
Rep. Sherae'a Moore [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Lockman [D] | Rep. Bryan Shupe [R] | Rep. Sherry Dorsey Walker [D] |
Rep. William Bush [D] | Rep. Edward Osienski [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-23 | Signed by Governor | |
2024-06-27 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2024-06-26 | Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2024-06-18 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |
2024-06-18 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2024-06-11 | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate | |
2024-06-11 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2024-05-22 | Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 6 On Its Merits | |
2024-05-02 | Adopted in lieu of the original bill HB 125, and Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House |