DE HB279 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-7)
Status: Passed on August 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-7)
Status: Passed on August 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill includes uniformed paramedics as an employee for purposes of the Delaware County and Municipal Police and Firefighter Pension Plan.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Delaware County And Municipal Police/firefighter Pension Plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-12 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (FINANCE) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate |
2014-04-08 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-04-02 | House | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 1 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits |
2014-03-25 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |