DE HB286 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-8)
Status: Enrolled on June 20 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-25 - Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 4 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 20 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-25 - Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 4 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Like House Bill No. 286, House Substitute No. 1 for House Bill No. 286 prohibits discrimination in life insurance based on genetic characteristics, genetic information, or the result of any genetic test.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 18 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Genetics Based Discrimination.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-25 | Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 4 ABSENT | |
2024-06-20 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2024-06-20 | Amendment SA 1 to HS 1 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2024-06-06 | Amendment SA 1 to HS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2024-05-22 | Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business, Insurance & Technology) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2024-03-19 | Assigned to Banking, Business, Insurance & Technology Committee in Senate | |
2024-03-19 | Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 4 ABSENT | |
2024-03-19 | Amendment HA 1 to HS 1 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2024-03-14 | Amendment HA 1 to HS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2024-03-13 | was introduced and adopted in lieu of HB 286 |