DE HB294 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on September 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on September 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This legislation requires an employer to shred or destroy employee records with personal identifying information when the employer no longer retains the records. An employee harmed by the employer’s failure to comply with this section can sue for triple damages.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 19 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Employment Practices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-02 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 15 YES 6 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (LABOR & INDUSTRIAL RELATIONS) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Assigned to Labor & Industrial Relations Committee in Senate |
2014-05-15 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-05-15 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2014-05-15 | House | Amendment HA 1 to HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2014-05-08 | House | Amendment HA 1 to HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2014-05-07 | House | Reported Out of Committee (LABOR) in House with 6 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits |
2014-05-07 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2014-04-09 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Labor Committee in House |