DE HB376 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill clarifies the duties of the Investigation Coordinator in the child protection system to have the authority to track each reported case of abuse or neglect, and to be responsible for tracking and monitoring each reported case of death, serious physical injury, and sexual abuse of a child within the Investigation Coordinator’s independent tracking system. This bill also creates confidentiality and immunity clauses to protect the information and records obtained by the Investigation Coordinator.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Abuse Of Children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-21 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |
2014-06-05 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-04 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 12 On Its Merits |
2014-05-29 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |