DE HB376 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3)
Status: Enrolled on June 20 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-20 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 4 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 20 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-20 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 4 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act implements a recommendation from the December 31, 2023, Report of the Retiree Healthcare Benefits Advisory Subcommittee. Under this Act, the state group health insurance program must include a pensioner coordination of benefits policy for eligible pensioners who were first employed by the State on or after January 1, 2015, and are eligible for health care coverage through their employer that is not through a plan under Chapter 52 of Title 29. The new pensioner coordination of benefits policy begins July 1, 2027, and must be comparable to the exiting coordination of benefits policy for the spouse of a state group health insurance program participant who is eligible for health care coverage through the spouse's own employer. This Act also codifies the existing spousal coordination of benefits policies for the state group health insurance program.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To State Health Care Insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-20 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 4 ABSENT | |
2024-06-18 | Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 7 On Its Merits | |
2024-06-13 | Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate | |
2024-06-13 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2024-06-12 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2024-05-16 | Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House |