DE HB465 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
In January 2018, the Code Revisors provided the General Assembly with a list of potential technical corrections that they identified as they revised the Delaware Code to reflect legislation that was enacted by the 149th General Assembly in 2017 or as they reviewed titles of the Code. While technical in nature, these changes are beyond the authority of the Code Revisors to make and can only be done by the General Assembly through legislation.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 6, Title 7, Title 8, Title 10, Title 11, Title 14, Title 16, Title 24, Title 29, And Title 30 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Technical Corrections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-04 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-27 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2018-06-27 | Rules Suspended in Senate | |
2018-06-27 | Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-21 | Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2018-06-21 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2018-06-21 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 465 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2018-06-20 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 4 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-20 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 465 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2018-06-14 | Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House |