FL H0043 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on November 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 64 (Ch. 2019-170)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 64 (Ch. 2019-170)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates Officer Lance Christian Whitaker Highway in Duval County; directs DOT to erect markers.
Title
Transportation Facility Designations
Sponsors
Sen. Tracie Davis [D] | Rep. Cord Byrd [R] | Rep. Kimberly Daniels [D] | Rep. Amy Mercado [D] |
Rep. Matt Willhite [D] | Sen. Clay Yarborough [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 64 (Ch. 2019-170) |
2019-04-17 | House | Substituted SB 64 |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/19 |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-04-10 | House | Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 24 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-08 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/10/19, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2019-04-03 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-29 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/02/19, 1:00 pm, Reed Hall |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-07 | House | Now in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | Favorable by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2019-01-31 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, 02/07/19, 10:30 am, Reed Hall |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2018-11-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S64 (Same As) 2019-07-08 - Chapter No. 2019-170
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/43 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/43/BillText/Filed/PDF |