FL H0053 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates act as "Restoration of Civil Rights Act"; provides for automatic restoration of former felon's civil rights, other than right to own, possess, or use firearms, following completion of sentence of incarceration & community supervision; provides conditions for & exemptions from automatic restoration; provides for education concerning civil rights of people who have felony convictions; provides retroactive applicability; provides for contingent effect.
Title
Restoration of Civil Rights
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-01-09 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Judiciary Committee |
2016-11-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0051 (Related) 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S0270 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Judiciary
S0934 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice
S0270 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Judiciary
S0934 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
944 | 292 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 294 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 705 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/53 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0053/BillText/Filed/PDF |