FL H0063 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Fiscal Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Fiscal Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring hospitals & ambulatory surgical centers to adopt & implement policies requiring use of smoke evacuation systems during certain surgical procedures.
Title
Protection from Surgical Smoke
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#630 (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - House - House Select Committee on Health Innovation (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - House - House Select Committee on Health Innovation (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Fiscal Policy |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Received |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Fiscal Policy |
2024-02-15 | Senate | In Messages |
2024-02-15 | House | Passed; YEAS 115, NAYS 1 |
2024-02-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-15 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2024-02-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-12 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/15/2024) |
2024-02-08 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2024-02-08 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2024-02-08 | House | Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | Favorable by Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda |
2024-01-24 | House | Now in Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-01-24 | House | Reported out of Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-01-24 | House | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-01-22 | House | Added to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-17 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-01-17 | House | Reported out of Select Committee on Health Innovation |
2024-01-16 | House | Favorable by Select Committee on Health Innovation |
2024-01-11 | House | Added to Select Committee on Health Innovation agenda |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-10-05 | House | Now in Select Committee on Health Innovation |
2023-10-05 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-10-05 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-10-05 | House | Referred to Select Committee on Health Innovation |
2023-09-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S410 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in Fiscal Policy