FL H0087 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-05 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-05 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes amendment to State Constitution to remove authority for county charter to specify method for choosing certain county officers; prohibit special law from specifying method for choosing property appraiser; requiring county voter approval to abolish a county office & transfer duties; removes authority for county charter to transfer certain duties of the clerk of circuit court.
Title
Selection and Duties of County Officers
Sponsors
Sen. Manny Diaz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-05 | House | Withdrawn prior to introduction |
2016-12-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0136 (Same As) 2017-05-01 - Withdrawn from further consideration
S0138 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Withdrawn from further consideration
S0130 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Withdrawn from further consideration
S0132 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Withdrawn from further consideration
S0134 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Withdrawn from further consideration
H0187 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Community Affairs
H0271 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Judiciary Committee
H0571 (Similar To) 2017-03-01 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
H0721 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died on Calendar
H1129 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Judiciary Committee
S0138 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Withdrawn from further consideration
S0130 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Withdrawn from further consideration
S0132 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Withdrawn from further consideration
S0134 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Withdrawn from further consideration
H0187 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Community Affairs
H0271 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Judiciary Committee
H0571 (Similar To) 2017-03-01 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
H0721 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died on Calendar
H1129 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/87 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0087/BillText/Filed/PDF |