FL H0099 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes corporate income tax credit of up to specified amount for degree-seeking student hired by certain businesses after internship by student; provides eligibility criteria; authorizes DOR to adopt rules governing applications & establish qualification requirements; authorizes business to carry forward tax credit for specified period.
Title
Internship Tax Credit Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-01-09 | House | Referred to Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; Education Committee |
2016-12-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0846 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Education
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/99 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0099/BillText/Filed/PDF |