FL H0101 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Finance and Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Finance and Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts certain obligations from nonrecurring intangible personal property tax; exempts certain documents that transfer real property from tax; exempts certain notes, written obligations, mortgages, or other evidences of indebtedness from tax; reduces tax on rental or license fees charged for use of real property; revises term "mail order sale" to specifically include sales of tangible personal property ordered through Internet or dealer in foreign country; provides that certain persons who make mail order sales & have nexus with state are subject to state's power to collect sales tax when engaged in certain activities; specifies that certain dealers are not required to collect sales tax unless certain circumstances exist; creates rebuttable presumption that dealer is subject to state's power to collect sales tax; creates annual sales tax holiday for school supplies, personal computers, & personal computer-related accessories; creates Restaurant & Hotel Renovation Tax Refund Program with administration by DEO; authorizes applicant to receive tax refund under certain circumstances; requires DOR to develop system to track changes in sales tax remitted & submit reports to Governor & Legislature.
Title
Taxation
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Steube [R] | Rep. Dane Eagle [R] | Rep. Walter Hill [R] | Sen. Travis Hutson [R] |
Rep. Dwayne Taylor [D] | Rep. Charles Van Zant [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Finance and Tax Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-01-08 | House | Referred to Finance and Tax Committee; Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2014-12-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0140 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations
H0739 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee
S0900 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
H7141 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations
H0739 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee
S0900 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
H7141 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
199 | 133 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
201 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
201 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 0596 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 0802 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 099 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/101 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0101/BillText/Filed/PDF |