FL H0115 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-30 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 160 (Ch. 2013-123)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-30 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 160 (Ch. 2013-123)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires DOH to waive specified fees relating to licensure & certification of professions within jurisdiction of DOH for honorably discharged military veterans; provides for application & waiver requirements.
Title
Professional Licensure of Military Veterans by Department of Health
Sponsors
Sen. Daphne Campbell [D] | Rep. Matt Gaetz [R] | Sen. Gayle Harrell [R] | Rep. Patrick Rooney [R] |
Rep. Clovis Watson [D] | House Health Quality Subcommittee | Rep. David Santiago [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-30 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 160 (Ch. 2013-123) |
2013-04-30 | House | Substituted CS/CS/SB 160 |
2013-04-29 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/30/13 |
2013-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-03-22 | House | Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-20 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 03/22/13, 8:30 am, Morris Hall |
2013-03-12 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2013-03-12 | House | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-08 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/12/13, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2013-03-05 | House | CS by Health Quality Subcommittee read 1st time |
2013-03-05 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2013-03-05 | House | Favorable by Veteran and Military Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-03-01 | House | On Committee agenda-- Veteran and Military Affairs Subcommittee, 03/05/13, 1:00 pm, 12 HOB |
2013-02-19 | House | Now in Veteran and Military Affairs Subcommittee |
2013-02-15 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-02-07 | House | CS by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2013-01-31 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 02/07/13, 2:00 pm, 306 HOB |
2013-01-23 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Veteran and Military Affairs Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2013-01-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0160 (Similar To) 2013-06-10 - Chapter No. 2013-123
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
456 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 304 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |