FL H0115 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - Chapter No. 2015-132
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - Chapter No. 2015-132
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Redefines "victim" for purposes of restitution provisions to include governmental entities & political subdivisions; requires sentencing judge to order restitution & specified number of community service work hours for violations of provisions relating to bribery & misuse of public office & offenses by public officers & employees.
Title
Sentencing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#25 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#235 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#235 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-15 | Chapter No. 2015-132 | |
2015-06-11 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-06-11 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2015-04-24 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Substituted for SB 732 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Withdrawn from Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Fiscal Policy |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Received |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Fiscal Policy |
2015-04-22 | Senate | In Messages |
2015-04-22 | House | Passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-21 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-17 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/15 |
2015-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-04-08 | House | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-06 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/08/15, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-17 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2015-02-17 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2015-02-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/17/15, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2015-02-03 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2015-02-03 | House | Favorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2015-01-27 | House | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 02/03/15, 4:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2015-01-08 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2014-12-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0732 (Same As) 2015-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 115 (Ch. 2015-132)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
775 | 089 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
838 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
839 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |