FL H0137 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urges Congress to propose to states amendment to U.S. Constitution that allows Congress to deem law that has been declared void by certain federal courts active & operational & that allows state to deem state law that has been declared void by that state's courts active & operational.
Title
Federal and State Court Rulings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-09-14 | House | Referred to Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2017-09-05 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/137 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/137/BillText/Filed/PDF |