FL H0147 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 30-10-2)
Status: Introduced on October 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 286 (Ch. 2014-175)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 286 (Ch. 2014-175)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates Florida Concrete Masonry Education Council, Inc.; requires council to operate under written contract with DEO; provides powers & duties of council; provides restrictions; provides for appointment & terms of governing board of council; authorizes council to accept grants, donations, contributions, & gifts under certain circumstances; authorizes council to make payments to other organizations under certain circumstances; provides for collection of voluntary assessment on concrete masonry units; requires manufacturers who elect to pay assessment to commit to paying assessment for specified period; requires council to adopt bylaws; provides for adoption of bylaws & amendments to bylaws.
Title
Concrete Masonry Education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-29 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 286 (Ch. 2014-175) |
2014-04-29 | House | Substituted CS/CS/SB 286 |
2014-04-28 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/14 |
2014-04-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-04-11 | House | CS/CS by Economic Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2014-04-11 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-04-11 | House | CS/CS by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-09 | House | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 04/11/14, 8:00 am, Reed Hall |
2014-03-25 | House | Now in Economic Affairs Committee |
2014-03-24 | House | Favorable by Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-20 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/24/14, 12:30 pm, Reed Hall |
2014-03-07 | House | Now in Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee |
2014-03-07 | House | CS referred to Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee |
2014-03-07 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Government Operations Subcommittee; Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2014-03-06 | House | CS by Higher Education and Workforce Subcommittee read 1st time |
2014-03-06 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-03-05 | House | CS by Higher Education and Workforce Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-03-03 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Higher Education and Workforce Subcommittee, 03/05/14, 4:00 pm, Reed Hall |
2013-11-05 | House | Referred to Higher Education and Workforce Subcommittee; Government Operations Subcommittee; Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2013-10-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0286 (Similar To) 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-175