FL H0163 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires certain prospective buyers to receive disclosure summary before closing on contract for purchase of property in dependent special district; specifies contents of disclosure summary; specifies circumstances under which sales contract may be voided by buyer; authorizes purchasers of property within dependent district to rescind sales contract or collect damages from developer under specified conditions; specifies length of time for which such right applies; authorizes prevailing party to recover reasonable attorney fees; prohibits expenditure of specified funds in defense of action.
Title
Dependent Special Districts
Sponsors
Rep. John Cortes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Civil Justice Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-01-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1254 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Community Affairs
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
189 | 023 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
189 | 024 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/163 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/163/BillText/Filed/PDF |