FL H0167 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Finance & Tax Council
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Finance & Tax Council
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Deletes exemption for sales of drinking water in containers.
Title
Tax on Sales, Use, and Other Transactions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Finance & Tax Council | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Finance & Tax Council; Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development -HJ 00022 | |
2009-10-23 | Referred to Finance & Tax Council; Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development | |
2009-10-01 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0216 (Similar To) 2010-03-18 - Withdrawn from Finance and Tax; General Government Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules -SJ 00268; Withdrawn from further consideration -SJ 00268
S0152 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Environmental Preservation and Conservation
S0152 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Environmental Preservation and Conservation