FL H0181 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits state & political subdivisions that contract for construction, maintenance, repair, or improvement of public works from imposing certain conditions on certain contractors, subcontractors, material suppliers, or carriers; provides exception; prohibits state & political subdivisions from restricting qualified bidders from submitting bids, being awarded any bid or contract, or performing work on public works project; revises filing requirements for written protests to contract solicitations or awards.
Title
Public Works Projects
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Died in Government Operations Subcommittee |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-01-23 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2013-01-15 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1118 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Community Affairs
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/181 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0181/BillText/Filed/PDF |