FL H0181 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides requirements for air conditioning in inmate housing units in DOC.
Title
Air Conditioning in Inmate Housing
Sponsors
Rep. Angela Nixon [D] | Rep. Christopher Benjamin [D] | Rep. Anna Eskamani [D] | Rep. Jennifer Harris [D] |
Rep. Yvonne Hayes Hinson [D] | Rep. Johanna Lopez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-11-02 | House | Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-11-02 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2023-11-02 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-11-02 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-10-16 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H233 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S296 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in Criminal Justice
S1702 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Criminal Justice
S296 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in Criminal Justice
S1702 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Criminal Justice
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/181 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/181/BillText/Filed/PDF |