FL H0243 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands definition of term "public officer"; creates additional prohibitions against doing business with one's agency, accepting unauthorized compensation, having conflicting employment or contractual relationships, lobbying, or consulting; revises construction of code of ethics for public officers & employees; provides criminal penalties for code violations.
Title
Standards of Conduct
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA) | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Rules and Calendar Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00028 | |
2009-11-01 | Referred to Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Rules and Calendar Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council | |
2009-10-16 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1916 (Similar To) 2010-04-16 - Withdrawn from Ethics and Elections; Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules -SJ 00635; Withdrawn from further consideration -SJ 00635
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0112 | 313 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0112 | 316 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0112 | 317 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0420 | 5061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |