FL H0255 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Defines "electroconvulsive treatment" & "psychosurgical procedure"; provides only physician may perform such treatment & procedures; prohibits performance of such treatment & procedures on certain persons; provides exception.
Title
Psychiatric Treatments
Sponsors
House Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee | Rep. Carolina Amesty [R] | Rep. Alina Garcia [R] | Rep. Vicki Lopez [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-01 - House - House Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Died in Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-02-05 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2024-02-05 | House | Now in Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-02-02 | House | CS Filed |
2024-02-02 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-02-02 | House | Reported out of Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | Favorable with CS by Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2024-01-30 | House | Added to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-11-02 | House | Now in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2023-11-02 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-11-02 | House | Referred to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2023-10-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S252 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in Health Policy