FL H0295 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires certain listings to include estimated ad valorem taxes; prohibits current owner's ad valorem taxes from being displayed or used for certain purposes; provides requirements for listing platforms, the Department of Revenue, & property appraisers; provides liability protection.
Title
Disclosure of Estimated Ad Valorem Taxes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-14 - House - House Ways & Means Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Died in Commerce Committee |
2024-02-16 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2024-02-16 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2024-02-15 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2024-02-15 | House | CS Filed |
2024-02-15 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-02-15 | House | Reported out of Ways & Means Committee |
2024-02-14 | House | Favorable with CS by Ways & Means Committee |
2024-02-12 | House | Added to Ways & Means Committee agenda |
2024-01-24 | House | Now in Ways & Means Committee |
2024-01-24 | House | Reported out of Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2024-01-24 | House | Favorable by Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2024-01-22 | House | Added to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-11-13 | House | Now in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2023-11-13 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2023-11-13 | House | Referred to Ways & Means Committee |
2023-11-13 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2023-10-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S380 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Finance and Tax