FL H0305 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Chapter No. 2015-89
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Chapter No. 2015-89
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Defines term "transient occupant"; provides factors that establish transient occupancy; provides for removal of transient occupant by law enforcement officer; provides cause of action for wrongful removal; limits actions for wrongful removal; provides civil action for removal of transient occupant.
Title
Unlawful Detention by a Transient Occupant
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | House Civil Justice Subcommittee | Rep. Shawn Harrison [R] | Rep. Janet Adkins [R] |
Sen. Ben Albritton [R] | Sen. Douglas Broxson [R] | Rep. Katie Edwards [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#22 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#107 (Y: 110 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#107 (Y: 110 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | Chapter No. 2015-89 | |
2015-06-02 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-05-18 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2015-04-22 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2015-04-22 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 656 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Withdrawn from Judiciary; Regulated Industries; Rules |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Regulated Industries; Rules |
2015-04-15 | Senate | In Messages |
2015-04-09 | House | CS passed; YEAS 110 NAYS 5 |
2015-04-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-08 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-06 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/08/15 |
2015-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-27 | House | CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time |
2015-03-27 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-03-26 | House | CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 1 |
2015-03-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 03/26/15, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2015-03-17 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 03/19/15, 12:30 pm, Reed Hall --Temporarily postponed |
2015-03-16 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2015-03-13 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2015-03-13 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-03-11 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-09 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 03/11/15, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2015-01-16 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0656 (Similar To) 2015-04-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 305 (Ch. 2015-89)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
82 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
83 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
83 | 43 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |