FL H0305 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates act as "Child Safety Alarm Act"; requires vehicles used by child care facilities & large family child care homes to be equipped with alarm system that prompts driver to inspect vehicle for children before exiting vehicle; requires DCF to maintain list of approved alarm systems.
Title
Child Care Facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-10-18 | House | Referred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2017-10-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S486 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/305 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/305/BillText/Filed/PDF |