FL H0337 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Chapter No. 2019-58
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Chapter No. 2019-58
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for modified revenue projection relating to proposed budget of clerks of the court; requiring specified filing fees for appeals from certain county courts; increasing the jurisdictional limit for actions at law by county courts on specified dates; providing county court civil filing fees for claims of specified values, etc.
Title
Courts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#370 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#209 (Y: 111 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#209 (Y: 111 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | Chapter No. 2019-58 | |
2019-05-24 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-05-22 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2019-05-03 | House | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2019-05-03 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 109 NAYS 0 |
2019-05-03 | House | Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (938140) 1255 |
2019-05-03 | House | In returning messages |
2019-05-03 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 36 NAYS 0 |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (252840) |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/CS/SB 328 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Received |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2019-04-24 | Senate | In Messages |
2019-04-24 | House | CS passed; YEAS 111 NAYS 4 |
2019-04-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-23 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-18 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/19 |
2019-04-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-04-17 | House | CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time |
2019-04-17 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-04-16 | House | CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-12 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/16/19, 1:30 pm, Sumner Hall |
2019-04-02 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-29 | House | On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/02/19, 1:00 pm, Mashburn Hall |
2019-03-25 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2019-03-25 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2019-03-22 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-03-20 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 1 |
2019-03-18 | House | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 03/20/19, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2019-03-11 | House | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 03/13/19, 8:30 am, Sumner Hall -- Temporarily postponed |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S328 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 337 (Ch. 2019-58)
S7072 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5011 (Ch. 2019-95), CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
S642 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2019-91), HB 5011 (Ch. 2019-95), CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167), CS/SB 160 (Ch. 2019-45), CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2019-50), SB 910 (Ch. 2019-61), CS/CS/SB 1418 (Ch. 2019-134)
H5011 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-95, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2019-115)
H1143 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 337 (Ch. 2019-58)
S1076 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 337 (Ch. 2019-58)
S7072 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5011 (Ch. 2019-95), CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
S642 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2019-91), HB 5011 (Ch. 2019-95), CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167), CS/SB 160 (Ch. 2019-45), CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2019-50), SB 910 (Ch. 2019-61), CS/CS/SB 1418 (Ch. 2019-134)
H5011 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-95, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2019-115)
H1143 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 337 (Ch. 2019-58)
S1076 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 337 (Ch. 2019-58)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
26 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 52 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 2401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 241 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 36 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 37 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 193 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
318 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
318 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
318 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 245 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
327 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
327 | 73 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
34 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
34 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
379 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
44 | 108 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
55 | 505 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
713 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
721 | 83 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 365 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 3678 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
766 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
938 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |