FL H0359 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires county or municipality enacting an ordinance relating to animal control or cruelty to impose specified surcharge on civil penalty for violations of ordinance; specifies use of proceeds of surcharge; provides construction.
Title
Animal Control or Cruelty Ordinances
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 36 | |
2011-02-07 | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee -HJ 36 | |
2011-01-24 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0676 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/359 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0359/BillText/Filed/HTML |