FL H0387 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 504 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 504 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revises legislative intent; requires probable cause of sexual abuse in order to create presumption of detriment; provides that persons meeting specified criteria may not visit or have contact with child without hearing & court order; revises requirements for hearing seeking to rebut presumption of detriment; revises provisions relating to hearings on whether to prohibit or restrict visitation or other contact with person who is alleged to have influenced child's testimony.
Title
Child Visitation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-03 | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 504 (Ch. | |
2011-05-02 | Temporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading -HJ 987 | |
2011-04-29 | Read 2nd time -HJ 906 | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/11 | |
2011-04-21 | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 | |
2011-04-19 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/21/11, 11:00 am, 404 HOB | |
2011-04-14 | Now in Judiciary Committee -HJ 644 | |
2011-04-13 | Favorable by Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 644 | |
2011-04-11 | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/13/11, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall | |
2011-04-05 | Original reference(s) removed: Health and Human Services Access Subcommittee | |
2011-04-04 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-04-01 | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 409 | |
2011-03-30 | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 04/01/11, 8:45 am, 404 HOB | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 38 | |
2011-02-07 | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; HHS Access Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 38 | |
2011-01-24 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0504 () 2011-05-04 - Ordered enrolled -SJ 851