FL H0391 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 592 (Ch. 2016-159)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 592 (Ch. 2016-159)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides exemption from public records requirements for certain identifying information of current or former emergency medical technicians or paramedics certified under ch. 401, F.S.; provides for future legislative review and repeal of exemption; provides statement of public necessity.
Title
Pub. Rec./Emergency Medical Technicians or Paramedics
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Government Operations Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 592 (Ch. 2016-159) |
2016-01-12 | House | Now in Government Operations Subcommittee |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2016-01-11 | House | Favorable by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 01/11/16, 4:00 pm, 306 HOB |
2015-10-30 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Government Operations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2015-10-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0320 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 592 (Ch. 2016-159)
S0592 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Chapter No. 2016-159
S0592 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Chapter No. 2016-159
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/391 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/0391/BillText/Filed/PDF |