FL H0391 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-08 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-08 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires each school district to implement drug & violence prevention program; provides purpose of program; provides program requirements & funding; authorizes SBE to adopt rules.
Title
Drug and Violence Prevention Programs
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Gruters [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-08 | House | Withdrawn prior to introduction |
2017-12-08 | House | Withdrawn from PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2017-11-01 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2017-10-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S802 (Same As) 2017-12-11 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/391 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/391/BillText/Filed/PDF |