FL H0397 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides specified entities may meet in private with their attorneys to discuss claims concerning private property rights; specifies what may be discussed during such meetings; requires such meetings be transcribed; provides transcripts become public records at specified times.
Title
Public Meetings
Sponsors
Rep. Kaylee Tuck [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | House | Died in Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-02-01 | House | Now in Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee |
2023-01-23 | House | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/397 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/397/BillText/Filed/PDF |