FL H0427 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Finance and Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Finance and Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates act as "Florida Student Internship Tax Credit"; provides tax credit against corporate income tax for hiring student interns; provides qualifying criteria for business & student intern; provides limitations & requirements with respect to program; provides that tax credit is equal to specified percentage of wages paid to student intern, subject to cap on total amount of credit claimable by business; authorizes DOR to adopt rules; authorizes business to carry forward unused tax credit for specified number of years.
Title
Florida Student Internship Tax Credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Finance and Tax Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to Finance and Tax Committee; Higher Education and Workforce Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2015-01-20 | House | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/427 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0427/BillText/Filed/PDF |