FL H0427 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that donation of human tissue by person who is knowingly infected with HIV to person who is not HIV-infected is felony; expands scope of unlawful acts by person infected with sexually transmissible disease; provides certain actions are not sufficient evidence to establish intent on part of person who transmits disease; provides applicability of criminal penalties for specified violations; removes fine for specified rule violations.
Title
HIV Prevention
Sponsors
Rep. Nicholas Duran [D] | Rep. John Cortes [D] | Rep. Anna Eskamani [D] | Rep. Joseph Geller [D] |
Rep. Dotie Joseph [D] | Rep. Cindy Polo [D] | Rep. Carlos Smith [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-10-30 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-10-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S626 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
S1516 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1187
H1143 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
S1516 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1187
H1143 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
381 | 0041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
384 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
384 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
384 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/427 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/427/BillText/Filed/PDF |