FL H0427 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-07 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-07 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Fresh From Florida Roadside Farm Stand Signage Program & adjunct advisory council within DACS to provide uniform directional signage for certified roadside farm stands; authorizes Commissioner of Agriculture to make certain designations; provides program requirements & fees; requires DOT, upon request, to place signage at specified locations.
Title
Roadside Farm Stand Signage
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-07 | House | Withdrawn prior to introduction |
2021-11-05 | House | Now in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2021-11-05 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2021-11-05 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-11-05 | House | Referred to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2021-10-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1212 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
S1214 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
H901 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
S1214 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
H901 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
570 | 851 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 8511 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/427 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/427/BillText/Filed/PDF |