FL H0467 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on June 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - Chapter No. 2015-146, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 465 (Ch. 2015-145)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on June 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - Chapter No. 2015-146, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 465 (Ch. 2015-145)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises exemption from public records requirements for certain criminal intelligence & investigative information to exempt information that reveals identity of victims of certain human trafficking offenses; provides exemption from public records requirements for investigative information relating to criminal history records of human trafficking victims that have been ordered expunged; provides for future legislative review & repeal of exemption; provides statement of public necessity; provides for contingent effect.
Title
Pub. Rec./Human Trafficking Victims
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#42 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#129 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#129 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-15 | Chapter No. 2015-146, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 465 (Ch. 2015-145) | |
2015-06-11 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-06-11 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2015-04-23 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 1108 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Withdrawn from Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations |
2015-04-21 | Senate | In Messages |
2015-04-16 | House | Passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-15 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-13 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/15/15 |
2015-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-26 | House | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 03/26/15, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2015-03-11 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | Favorable by Government Operations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-09 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Subcommittee, 03/11/15, 8:00 am, Webster Hall |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-11 | House | Now in Government Operations Subcommittee |
2015-02-11 | House | Favorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2015-02-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 02/11/15, 3:30 pm, Sumner Hall |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Government Operations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2015-01-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0465 (Related) 2015-06-15 - Chapter No. 2015-145, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 467 (Ch. 2015-146), HB 469 (Ch. 2015-147)
S1108 (Same As) 2015-04-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 467 (Ch. 2015-146), CS/CS/HB 465 (Ch. 2015-145)
S1106 (Similar To) 2015-04-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 465 (Ch. 2015-145), HB 467 (Ch. 2015-146), HB 469 (Ch. 2015-147)
S1108 (Same As) 2015-04-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 467 (Ch. 2015-146), CS/CS/HB 465 (Ch. 2015-145)
S1106 (Similar To) 2015-04-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 465 (Ch. 2015-145), HB 467 (Ch. 2015-146), HB 469 (Ch. 2015-147)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
119 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 0583 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |