FL H0511 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds 911 public safety telecommunicators to class; requires such members to have retirement benefits calculated in accordance with provisions for Regular Class members; specifies required employer retirement contribution rates for new membership subclass of 911 public safety telecommunicators; declares that act fulfills important state interest.
Title
Special Risk Class of the Florida Retirement System
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Willhite [D] | Rep. John Cortes [D] | Rep. Nicholas Duran [D] | Rep. Anna Eskamani [D] |
Rep. Evan Jenne [D] | Rep. David Santiago [R] | Rep. Carlos Smith [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-01-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S574 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
S744 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
H803 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
S1190 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
S744 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
H803 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
S1190 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
121 | 0515 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 71 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/511 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/511/BillText/Filed/PDF |